This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/18/2018 at 23:15:24 (UTC).

ALONZO VS ARIKA METALS INC

Case Summary

On 09/12/2017 ALONZO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ARIKA METALS INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7001

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REBECCA ALONZO

Defendants

ARIKA METALS INC

SCOTT MCKEEVER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANTIAGO & JONES

21300 Victory Blvd, Ste 810

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorney

JACKSON LEWIS LLP

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5408

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY R

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY REBECCA ALONZO FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

MINUTE ORDER: ON COURTS OWN MT

MINUTE ORDER: ON COURTS OWN MTN RE: CHANGES TO 3-12-18

NOTICE OF VACATING CASE MANAGE

NOTICE OF VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING AND SCHEDULING OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE BY REBECCA ALONZO FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY A

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY ARIKA METALS INC, SCOTT MCKEEVER FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/12/2017 OF REBECCA ALONZO BY ARIKA METALS INC, SCOTT MCKEEVER REPRESENTED BY JACKSON LEWIS LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT RE-ASSIGN

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT RE-ASSIGNMENT FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92882.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/12/2017 OF REBECCA ALONZO AND FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/12/2017 OF REBECCA ALONZO AS TO ARIKA METALS INC; MAILING DATE OF 11/03/17 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/12/2017 OF REBECCA ALONZO AS TO SCOTT MCKEEVER; MAILING DATE OF 11/03/17 FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING AND SCHEDULING OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE BY REBECCA ALONZO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: ON COURTS OWN MTN RE: CHANGES TO 3-12-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY REBECCA ALONZO FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SUBMITTED BY REBECCA ALONZO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY ARIKA METALS INC, SCOTT MCKEEVER FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO HONORABLE JUDGE RANDALL S STAMEN IN DEPARTMENT 07 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT RE-ASSIGNMENT FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/12/2017 OF REBECCA ALONZO BY ARIKA METALS INC, SCOTT MCKEEVER REPRESENTED BY JACKSON LEWIS LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/12/2017 OF REBECCA ALONZO AS TO SCOTT MCKEEVER; MAILING DATE OF 11/03/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/12/2017 OF REBECCA ALONZO AS TO ARIKA METALS INC; MAILING DATE OF 11/03/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 11/13/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/12/2017 OF REBECCA ALONZO AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92882.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less