This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/04/2017 at 12:14:37 (UTC).

ALL OF US OR NONE-RIVERSIDE VS HAMRICK JR

Case Summary

On 10/14/2016 ALL OF US OR NONE-RIVERSIDE filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against HAMRICK JR. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3524

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JANE ROE

ALL OF US OR NONE-RIVERSIDE CHAPTER

Respondents

JOURNAL TECHNOLOGIES INC

RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT

W SAMUEL HAMRICK JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

DHF LAW

A NEW WAY OF LIFE REENTRY PROJECT

SOCIAL JUSTICE LAWPROJECT

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT FOR RECORD RETURNED FR

RECEIPT FOR RECORD RETURNED FROM SAN DIEGO COUNTY NEW CASE NUMBER 37-2017-00003005-CU-MC-NC

COPY OF ORDER OF ASSIGNMENT TO

COPY OF ORDER OF ASSIGNMENT TO SAN DIEGO

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO THE 1

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO THE 12/13/16 HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE) FILED 10/14/2016 OF ALL OF US OR NONE-RIVERSIDE CHAPTER AS TO JOURNAL TECHNOLOGIES INC; MAILING DATE OF 11/29/16 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE WRIT O

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE) FILED 10/14/2016 OF ALL OF US OR NONE-RIVERSIDE CHAPTER SERVED ON RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/29/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE) FILED 10/14/2016 OF ALL OF US OR NONE-RIVERSIDE CHAPTER AS TO W SAMUEL HAMRICK JR; MAILING DATE OF 11/29/16 FILED.

TABLE OF EXHIBITS AND EXHIBITS

TABLE OF EXHIBITS AND EXHIBITS FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON WRIT OF MAND

SUMMONS ISSUED ON WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE) FILED 10/14/2016 OF ALL OF US OR NONE-RIVERSIDE CHAPTER AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92501.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NT

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NTC OF DEPT ASSIGNMENT AND STATUS CONFERENCE.

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE) FILED. (RIVERSIDE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketSTATUS HEARING RE: WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE); Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR RECORD RETURNED FROM SAN DIEGO COUNTY NEW CASE NUMBER 37-2017-00003005-CU-MC-NC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT SUBMITTED BY JOURNAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR RECORD SENT TO THE SUPERIOR COURT--COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketCHECK #0000 IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketCASE ORDERED TRANSFERRED (OUT) TO THE SUPERIOR COURT-COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER OF ASSIGNMENT TO SAN DIEGO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketCOURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: RECUSAL OF THE ENTIRE BENCH IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • DocketSTATUS HEARING RE: WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE); Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO THE 12/13/16 HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2016
  • DocketON WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE) FILED 10/14/2016 OF ALL OF US OR NONE-RIVERSIDE CHAPTER AS TO JANE ROE ATTORNEY SOCIAL JUSTICE LAWPROJECT ADDED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • DocketON WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE) FILED 10/14/2016 OF ALL OF US OR NONE-RIVERSIDE CHAPTER AS TO ALL OF US OR NONE-RIVERSIDE CHAPTER ATTORNEY DHF LAW ADDED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTABLE OF EXHIBITS AND EXHIBITS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • DocketPETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - EXTRAORDNINARY WRITS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE) FILED 10/14/2016 OF ALL OF US OR NONE-RIVERSIDE CHAPTER AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92501.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NTC OF DEPT ASSIGNMENT AND STATUS CONFERENCE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07 - WRIT OF MANDATE/PROHIBITION/REVIEW (RIVERSIDE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • DocketSTATUS HEARING SET 12/13/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 07

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE) FILED. (RIVERSIDE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less