This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/04/2017 at 16:22:03 (UTC).

ADVANCED FRAMING STRUCTURES INC VS ELITE CONCEPT

Case Summary

On 11/09/2016 ADVANCED FRAMING STRUCTURES INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ELITE CONCEPT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4927

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADVANCED FRAMING STRUCTURES INC

Defendants

AMRAPUR OVERSEAS INC

MICHAEL A FERRARO

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY

ELITE CONCEPT SERVICES INC

PADMA LAXMI LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHEATLEY & OSAKI

 

Court Documents

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/09/2016 OF ADVANCED FRAMING STRUCTURES INC AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92879.

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - OVER $10K/UNDER $25K FILED. (RIVERSIDE)

 

Docket Entries

05/08/2017

DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2017

DocketADVANCED FRAMING STRUCTURES INC/WHEATLEY & OSAKI IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2017

DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 3/13/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2017
View Court Documents

DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2017

DocketNPSCTH HEARING SET FOR 01/09/17 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: OSC RE:SANCTIONS SET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2017

DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2016

DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 1/09/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2016
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/09/2016 OF ADVANCED FRAMING STRUCTURES INC AND FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2016
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92879.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2016

DocketLIMITED CIVIL CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11. (RIVERSIDE)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2016

DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL SET 5/08/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2016
View Court Documents

DocketLIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - OVER $10K/UNDER $25K FILED. (RIVERSIDE)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less