This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/31/2019 at 18:42:25 (UTC).

ADORADOR vs KB HOME COASTAL

Case Summary

On 09/19/2014 ADORADOR filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME COASTAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9047

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROSANGELA DE ALBA

ARMANDO GARCIA

ROSANNA SAUCEDA

DERWIN GOODEN

CLAUDIA HERNANDEZ

SANDRA JOHNSON

ALEJANDRO LUJANO

MIGUEL LUJANO

EMMANUEL NGATI

JENNY PENG

PHILLIP LIN

CARRIE LIN

MARIA CAROLINE PUMARADA

SARFRAZ SHAHBAZ

JERRY SMITH

MARIA SMITH

INDIVIDUAL HOMEOWNER CLASS RESPRESENTATIVES

DANNY ADORADOR

GEMMA ADORADOR

JOSE ACOSTA

66 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHINNICK & RYAN LLP

1650 Hotel Circle North Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92108

Other Attorneys

KOLETSKY MANCINI FELDMAN & MORROW

3460 Wilshire Blvd Eighth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

PCRC INC

39300 Civic Center Dr #300

Fremont, CA 94538

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD E BISHOP

One Mac Arthur Place #650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

FREDRICKSON, MAZEIKA & GRANT, LLP

5720 Oberlin Dr.

San Diego, CA 92121-1723

DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND

4500 E Pacific Coast Hwy 4Th F

Long Beach, CA 90804

WOOD,SMITH,HENNING& BERMAN LLP

10960 Wilshire Blvd 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024-3702

RESNICK & LOUIS

9891 Irvine Center Dr., #200

Irvine, CA 92618

LIEDLE LARSON LIDL& VAIL

12520 High Bluff Dr #200

San Diego, CA 92130

ARCHER NORRIS

4695 Macarthur Court #350

Newport Beach, CA 92660

LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M BUREK

550 North Parkcenter Drive Suite 204

Santa Ana, CA 92705

BREMER, WHYTE, BROWN OMEARA LLP

21271 Burbank Blvd Suite 110

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

LIEDLE LOUNSBERY LARSON & LIDILLP

12520 High Bluff Dr #200

San Diego, CA 92130

LETOFSKY-MCCLAIN

3655 Nobel Drive Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92122

GILL & RHOADES

1660 Union Street Suite 301

San Diego, CA 92101

SKEBBA ISAAC BISHOP & HENDERSON

One Macarthur Pl., Ste. 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

BREMER, WHYTE, BROWN O'MEARA LLP

21271 Burbank Blvd Suite 110

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

TRIAL RULES

TRIAL RULES

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2015 OF KB HOME GREATER LOSANGELES INC AS TO MASCO BUILDERS CABINET GROUP FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF TRIAL RULES ON SEE SERVICE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 08/12/16 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER DECLARATION OF ROY KOLET

ORDER DECLARATION OF ROY KOLETSKY IN RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER OF OSC RE FAILURE TO COMPLY AT MSC; HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

ORDER RECOMMENDATION OF MEDIAT

ORDER RECOMMENDATION OF MEDIATOR STACY LA SCALA ORDER RE SECOND AMENDMENT TO CMO TIMELINE; HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2015 OF KB HOME GREATER LOSANGELES INC AS TO AQUATIC CO FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2015 OF KB HOME GREATER LOSANGELES INC AS TO CAMPBELL CONCRETE OF CALIFORNIA FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2015 OF KB HOME GREATER LOSANGELES INC AS TO HONDO ELECTRIC INC FILED

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY CERTAI

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY CERTAIN CROSS-DEFENDANTS BY MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA INC, WESTERN INSULATIONLP FILED.

APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SET

APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA INC, WESTERN INSULATIONLP.

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE:APPLICATIO

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE:APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GFS BY CERTAIN XDEFTS & SUPPORTING PAPERS BY MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA INC, WESTERN INSULATIONLP FILED.

DECLARATION OF ELLIOT H HELLER

DECLARATION OF ELLIOT H HELLER IN SUPPORT/APPL/DETERMINE/GFS- WESTERN INSULATION LP/MASCO CONTRACTOR SERV FILED

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE:APPL/DETER

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE:APPL/DETERMINATION OF GFS BY CERTAIN XCROSS DEFTS & SUPPORTING PAPERS BY MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA INC, WESTERN INSULATIONLP FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC/APPL/D

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC/APPL/DECL/ORDER SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST SERVED 07/22/16 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE

SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE RE:NTC/APPL/DECL/ORDER FILED.

ORDER ON GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

ORDER ON GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED REGARDING CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2015 OF KB HOME GREATER LOSANGELES INC AND MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA INC, WESTERN INSULATIONLP.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2015 OF KB HOME GREATER LOSANGELES INC AS TO SOUTH COAST EQUIPMENT INC FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2015 OF KB HOME GREATER LOSANGELES INC AS TO ACCENT TILE INC FILED

229 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: DISMISS PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2015 OF KB HOME GREATER LOSANGELES INC AS TO STEEL-T A/C INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2015 OF KB HOME GREATER LOSANGELES INC AS TO SOUTHWEST FINISH &SUPPLY INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: 7/12/17 OSC RE DISMISSAL HEARING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2015 OF KB HOME GREATER LOSANGELES INC AS TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC COAST ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION INC FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ALLISON B ETKIN ESQ TO RULES OF COURT RE: WHY THE ENTIRE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
307 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DANNY ADORADOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY DANNY ADORADOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY DANNY ADORADOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DANNY ADORADOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92551.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FEE PAID ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/19/2014 OF DANNY ADORADOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COMPLEX CASE. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04 - COMPLEX CASE (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - COMPLEX CASE SET 12/01/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 04.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INDIVIDUAL HOMEOWNER CLASS REPRESENTATIVES is a litigant