Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 23:22:42 (UTC).

ACUMEN VS STAPLETON

Case Summary

On 11/14/2014 ACUMEN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against STAPLETON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1107

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AEONS ACUMEN

Beaumont, CA 92223

Defendants

MICHELINE STAPLETON

JAMES VILLEGAS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

170.6 FILED BY AEONS ACUMEN AG

170.6 FILED BY AEONS ACUMEN AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/14/2014 OF AEONS ACUMEN SERVED ON JAMES VILLEGAS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/14/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/14/2014 OF AEONS ACUMEN SERVED ON MICHELINE STAPLETON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/14/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/14/2014 OF AEONS ACUMEN AS TO MICHELINE STAPLETON, JAMES VILLEGAS

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 11/20/14

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY AEONS ACUMEN.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2015
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY AEONS ACUMEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 11/20/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/14/2014 OF AEONS ACUMEN AS TO MICHELINE STAPLETON, JAMES VILLEGAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/14/2014 OF AEONS ACUMEN SERVED ON MICHELINE STAPLETON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/14/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/14/2014 OF AEONS ACUMEN SERVED ON JAMES VILLEGAS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/14/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • 170.6 FILED BY AEONS ACUMEN AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 1/13/15 AT 8:00 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less