This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:03:31 (UTC).

ACKERMAN VS. U.S. HOME CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/07/2014 ACKERMAN filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against U S HOME CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0679

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RONDA ACKERMAN

OSVADLO GUZMAN

TINA MELINAUSKAS

ISMAEL RESENDIZ

YONG RUI

DONGQIN FENG

OSVALDO GUZMAN

JANETH EICKHOFF

DIRK ALTENHOFEN

JAMES KEENER

KAMANI WILKINS

AFROUZ NAMYARI-HURWITZ

YVONNE C MOORE

WENDY R BAILEY

WILLIAM BANEZ

HARRY KENDALL

SCOTT RYAN MCCAVERTY

Defendants

U.S. HOME CORPORATION

LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC

GREYSTONE HOMES INC

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHINNICK & RYAN LLP

1650 Hotel Circle North Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorney

NEWMEYER AND DILLION LLP

895 Dove Street 5Th Fl

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNED TO D

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 05 FOR ALL PURPOSES.

ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERE

ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

MOTION TO/FOR ORDER COMPELLIG

MOTION TO/FOR ORDER COMPELLIG JUDICIAL REFERENCE & APPOINTING A REFEREE UNDER CCP SECTION 638 BY RONDA ACKERMAN FILED

DECLARATION OF KEVIN B HAMBLY,

DECLARATION OF KEVIN B HAMBLY, ESQ FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST SERVED 06/15/18 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE 1

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF RONDA ACKERMAN AS TO CASA PLUMBING INC FILED BY RONDA ACKERMAN

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMIS

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS BY RONDA ACKERMAN FILED

ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON M

ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS BY URBAN CONCRETE INC, T.W.R. ENTERPRISESINC FILED

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF OSC HEARING RE DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF RONDA ACKERMAN AS TO PLAINTIFF ISMAEL RESENDIZ FILED

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RONDA ACKERMAN

CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE CRAIG

CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER IN DEPARTMENT 05 FOR ALL FUTURE PROCEEDINGS. (RIVERSIDE)

DECLARATION OF OF SERVICE BY M

DECLARATION OF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE RULING ON 2/25/15 FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF RONDA ACKERMAN AS TO PLAINTIFF WILLIAM BANEZ, ARNIE BANEZ, MAUREEN FILLEY, JAMES KEENER, JANETH EICKHOFF, THE GOOSTREE FAMILYTRUST FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF RONDA ACKERMAN AS TO PLAINTIFF JASON LARSON, STEFANIE LARSON, ROBERT B NEGRI JR, MARILYN TEARSTON, YOUSSEF CHOUKRI FILED

DECLARATION OF SERVICE RE REQU

DECLARATION OF SERVICE RE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF RONDA ACKERMAN AS TO PLAINTIFF ISMAEL RESENDIZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • JT HEARING SET FOR 01/18/19 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON 10/29/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • TRC HEARING SET FOR 12/28/18 AT 09:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON 10/29/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE SUBMITTED BY RONDA ACKERMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
158 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - COMPLEX CASE SET 7/07/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 06 - RESCHEDULED TO:.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - COMPLEX CASE SET 7/07/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO DEPARTMENT 03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92591.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FEE PAID ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/07/2014 OF RONDA ACKERMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - COMPLEX CASE SET 7/07/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 06.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COMPLEX CASE - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06 (COMPLEX CASE).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREYSTONE HOMES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where US HOME CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant