This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/03/2018 at 06:02:52 (UTC).

ACEVEDO VS COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Case Summary

On 10/05/2017 ACEVEDO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8884

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILTON ACEVEDO

Defendants

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

RIVERSIDE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANCINI & ASSOCIATIES

15303 Ventura Blvd Suite 600

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Defendant Attorney

SMITH LAW OFFICES LLP

4204 Riverwalk Pkwy., Ste.250

Riverside, CA 92505

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY MILTON ACEVEDO.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MILTON ACEVEDO

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/05/2017 OF MILTON ACEVEDO AS TO RIVERSIDE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM; MAILING DATE OF 10/23/17 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/05/2017 OF MILTON ACEVEDO SERVED ON COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/16/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/05/2017 OF MILTON ACEVEDO BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE REPRESENTED BY SMITH LAW OFFICES LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92502.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/05/2017 OF MILTON ACEVEDO AND FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER: RE HEARING 4/3/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MILTON ACEVEDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY MILTON ACEVEDO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY MILTON ACEVEDO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • FILING FEE OF $450.00 FOR COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE IS WAIVED-EXEMPT PER GOVT CODE 6103

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/05/2017 OF MILTON ACEVEDO BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE REPRESENTED BY SMITH LAW OFFICES LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RIVERSIDE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/05/2017 OF MILTON ACEVEDO SERVED ON COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/16/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/05/2017 OF MILTON ACEVEDO AS TO RIVERSIDE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM; MAILING DATE OF 10/23/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 12/05/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/05/2017 OF MILTON ACEVEDO AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92502.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less