This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 04:46:45 (UTC).

ABDELMESEEH & ABDELMESEEH

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 ABDELMESEEH ABDELMESEEH was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2598

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

YVETTE ABDELMESEEH

Respondent

AMIN ABDELMESEEH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WEST COAST LAW ANDMEDIATION

15338 Central Avenue

Chino, CA 91710

Respondent Attorney

CHRISTOPHER R ABERNATHY

9353 Fairway View Place Suite 120

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN) OF YVETTE ABDELMESEEH REMOVE ATTORNEY WEST COAST LAW ANDMEDIATION FOR PARTY YVETTE ABDELMESEEH AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY AMIN ABDELMESEEH. (FL-141)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL FILED BY AMIN ABDELMESEEH .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN) OF YVETTE ABDELMESEEH REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY AMIN ABDELMESEEH AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R ABERNATHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: WAGE ASSIGNMENT SUBMITTED BY YVETTE ABDELMESEEH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketEARNINGS ASSIGNMENT ORDER FOR SPOUSAL SUPPORT FILED BY YVETTE ABDELMESEEH; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F. BURGESS. (FL-435)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TEMPORARY SPOUSAL SUPPORT & ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY YVETTE ABDELMESEEH; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F. BURGESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketSTIPULATION & ORDER SUBMITTED BY YVETTE ABDELMESEEH HAS BEEN PREPPED AND FORWARDED TO F401 FOR SIGNATURE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketWAGE ASSIGNMENT SUBMITTED BY YVETTE ABDELMESEEH HAS BEEN PREPPED AND FORWARDED TO F401 FOR SIGNATURE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketCOPY(S) MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT F401 (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO COMMISSIONER JOAN F. BURGESS IN DEPARTMENT F401. (COMMISSIONER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT (COMMISSIONER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketFAMILY LAW PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketHEARING RE: FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL/JUDGMENT SET 6/29/22 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketHEARING RE: NON PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 6/29/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketPETITION FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketPETITIONER'S PLACE OF RESIDENCE OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketDATE OF MARRIAGE (PETITIONER): 07/16/88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketDATE OF SEPARATION (PETITIONER): 09/01/11.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher R. Abernathy