This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/07/2019 at 08:47:11 (UTC).

ABBEY VS RIVERSIDE COUNTY

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 ABBEY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RIVERSIDE COUNTY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9093

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PATRICIA L ABBEY

TOGNALLI TRUST

BRINDAMOUR

WILLIAM AND PAM ADLER

AINGE

LINDA AND LISA CARLSON

RICHARD GHYSELS

AUBREY DEAN JENKINS TRUST

ROBERT J AND SYDNEY RAE KALEF

DANIEL ALEGRE

SERGE BRAGHINI

JOEL EDWARD BONNERIII TRUST

PAUL AND ANGELA CORNELIUS

GREGORY B AND SUSAN BATEN

DONA MAE FRITZ ANDRUSSELL DAVID KNAPP

JEANNE KLIMOWSKI AND JAMES MCGAVIN

ESTATE OF WILLIAM KAPLAN

SEAN R AND JUDE A GOGAN

PETER HUSK

Defendant

RIVERSIDE COUNTY

131 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SLOVAK BARON EMPEYMURPHY & PINKNEY

FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED C

ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/10/2017 OF PATRICIA ABBEY AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; MAILING DATE OF 10/13/17 FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE PSC1404

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE PSC1404764 BY PATRICIA L ABBEY FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92501.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/10/2017 OF PATRICIA ABBEY AND FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

 

Docket Entries

04/09/2018

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2017

DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2017
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2017

DocketCOPY OF ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RIC1719093; PSC1501100 DESIGNATED AS THE MASTER FILE; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2017

DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER IN DEPARTMENT 05 FOR ALL FUTURE PROCEEDINGS. (RIVERSIDE)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2017

DocketHEARING IS SET ON 10/18/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2017

DocketHEARING RE: REASSIGN AND CONSOLIDATE CASE; Disposition: Completed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2017
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/10/2017 OF PATRICIA ABBEY AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; MAILING DATE OF 10/13/17 FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2017
View Court Documents

DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2017
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE PSC1404764 BY PATRICIA L ABBEY FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
10/10/2017

DocketON COMPLAINT FILED 10/10/2017 OF PATRICIA ABBEY AS TO ROBERT M SANDERS, CAROLE SANFILIPPO, PATRICIA A SANNES TRUSTEE OF THE DENNIS G, ROBERT SCHECHTER AND ELISABETHKLOCK, ANNE E SCHOLHAMER, ROBERT H SELLIN, GEORGE AND SUSAN SEYMOUR, DON AND VICKI SRIRO ATTORNEY FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP ADDED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2017

DocketON COMPLAINT FILED 10/10/2017 OF PATRICIA ABBEY AS TO MARIJANA AND KATARINA RAICEVIC, HIGHT S AND JANICEM REDMOND, GEORGE AND LYNNELLARENSHAW, NATALIE RICHTER, JASMIN RICHTER ANDSIGRID SCHUMAN, RODEBERG FAMILY TRUST, EILEEN S AND ALBERTJ RONNING, FREDRIC AND DIANE SAGAN ATTORNEY FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP ADDED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2017

DocketON COMPLAINT FILED 10/10/2017 OF PATRICIA ABBEY AS TO RICHARD L OLIVIER AND BARBARA OREED, HARDING ORREN, OSCAR J AND ANA P PAZ-ALTSCHUL, SHERYL PHILLIPS, KATHARINE PIZZUTI-BELL AND DENNIS C BELL, JOHN EDDY PRAY ANDWALTER LEROYBREWER, MICHAEL AND LINDA PROVENCHER, MARK D PUTTERBAUGH ATTORNEY FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP ADDED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2017

DocketON COMPLAINT FILED 10/10/2017 OF PATRICIA ABBEY AS TO RONALD MCDONALD, DONALD MCINNES ANDDAVID PITTMAN, PAMELA ANN MEADOWS, WILLIAM D AND ROSALIE A MESSERSMITH, ESTATE OF GEORGE EMILLER, MISSION COURT ENTERPRISES, JOHN MUSKAVITCH, NORA MARTIN DESIGNS ATTORNEY FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP ADDED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2017

DocketON COMPLAINT FILED 10/10/2017 OF PATRICIA ABBEY AS TO MICHAEL AND CHRISTIKAISER, ROBERT J AND SYDNEYRAE KALEF, HAROLD KATKOV, NORA M KING, JEANNE KLIMOWSKI AND JAMES MCGAVIN, PETER AND SHARON LAWSON, STEPHEN LOSH, CHARLES T MATHEWS ATTORNEY FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP ADDED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2017

DocketON COMPLAINT FILED 10/10/2017 OF PATRICIA ABBEY AS TO LEE AND CHERIE GRUENFELD, PHYLLIS HOLBROOK, PHYLLIS HOLBROOK AND WILLIAM AGIRIMONTE, HILDA HORVAT, LORI M HUEBNER, PETER HUSK, KATHLEEN INGRAM, VICTORIA KADISCHE ATTORNEY FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP ADDED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2017

DocketON COMPLAINT FILED 10/10/2017 OF PATRICIA ABBEY AS TO LAWRENCE FINE, KENNETH W FONTENOTAND KENRON TRUST, JEAN-MARC FORTIER AND DONAL VEILLEUX, CURTIS FOX, DONA MAE FRITZ ANDRUSSELL DAVID KNAPP, MICHAEL L AND DEBORAH L GEYER, RICHARD GHYSELS, SEAN R AND JUDE A GOGAN ATTORNEY FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP ADDED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2017

DocketON COMPLAINT FILED 10/10/2017 OF PATRICIA ABBEY AS TO LINDA AND LISA CARLSON, GREGORY P AND JACQUELINE M CASTRO, PAUL AND ANGELA CORNELIUS, RON AND CAROLYN DELISLE, BASILIO RAY AND MARIA CARINA DDUNGAO, ESTATE OF WILLIAM KAPLAN, PAUL J FELDSTEIN, GREG FILIMOWICZ ATTORNEY FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP ADDED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2017

DocketON COMPLAINT FILED 10/10/2017 OF PATRICIA ABBEY AS TO GREGORY B AND SUSANBATEN, JOEL EDWARD BONNERIII TRUST, SERGE BRAGHINI, ROBERT MARSHALL BRANDT, GARY S BRAZZI, DOUG AND CONNIE BRESDEN, THOMAS J BYRNES, DONNA CAPONI ATTORNEY FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP ADDED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2017

DocketON COMPLAINT FILED 10/10/2017 OF PATRICIA ABBEY AS TO PATRICIA L ABBEY, WILLIAM AND PAM ADLER, AINGE, BRINDAMOUR, TOGNALLI TRUST, DANIEL ALEGRE, AUBREY DEAN JENKINSTRUST, JODY AND HENRY BASILE ATTORNEY FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP ADDED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less