Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/22/2017 at 06:15:30 (UTC).

AANENSON/STONEWOOD VS PORTER

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 AANENSON/STONEWOOD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PORTER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4991

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AANSENSON/STONEWOOD APARTMENTS

Defendant

VIRGIE PORTER

Riverside, CA 92503

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF AANSENSON/STONEWOODAPARTMENTS BY VIRGIE PORTER REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON KIMBALL TREY & ST JOHN LLP WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/07/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF AANSENSON/STONEWOODAPARTMENTS AND FILED.

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY AANSENSON/STONEWOODAPARTMENTS - RIVERSIDE (FORM UD-150).

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000 (RIVERSIDE)

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF AANSENSON/STONEWOODAPARTMENTS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO VIRGIE PORTER; AND MAILED ON 03/23/17 FILED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY AANSENSON/STONEWOODAPARTMENTS.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92503.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF AANSENSON/STONEWOODAPARTMENTS AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY VIRGIE PORTER IS GRANTED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER DAVID E. GREGORY (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER DAVID E. GREGORY.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF AANSENSON/STONEWOODAPARTMENTS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 03/23/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY AANSENSON/STONEWOODAPARTMENTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RIVERSIDE; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER DAVID E. GREGORY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • FEE WAIVER FOR VIRGIE PORTER WAS GRANTED FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; $255.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY VIRGIE PORTER IS GRANTED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER DAVID E. GREGORY (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF AANSENSON/STONEWOODAPARTMENTS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO VIRGIE PORTER; AND MAILED ON 03/23/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF AANSENSON/STONEWOODAPARTMENTS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 03/23/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF AANSENSON/STONEWOODAPARTMENTS BY VIRGIE PORTER REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92503.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF AANSENSON/STONEWOODAPARTMENTS AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000 (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 5/22/17 AT 8:00 IN CLER

    Read MoreRead Less