Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/21/2020 at 19:17:09 (UTC).

AA2 VS JENKINS

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 AA2 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JENKINS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0442

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Corona Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AA2, LLC

Defendants

PRISCILLA CORNEJO

LORENZA JENKINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BYRNE & ASSOCIATES

139 E Olive Avenue Suite 100

Monrovia, CA 91016

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(CORONA)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/21/2020 OF AA2, LLC AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92504.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR /TO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR /TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY AA2, LLC FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE CHRISTOPHER B. HARMON.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • HearingDept: CLEC; Action text: DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR /TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY AA2, LLC FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE CHRISTOPHER B. HARMON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY AA2, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(CORONA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT C1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (CORONA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/21/2020 OF AA2, LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92504.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketPREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE: UD OSC SET 3/23/20 AT 8:00 IN CLEC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AA2 LLC is a litigant