This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/19/2016 at 23:06:43 (UTC).

901275 ALBERTA LTD VS LLO HOLDINGS

Case Summary

On 07/22/2011 901275 ALBERTA LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LLO HOLDINGS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5971

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

901275 ALBERTA LTDAN ALBERTA CANADIAN LIMI

901275 ALBERTA LTD

Defendants

LLO HOLDINGS INC APANAMA CORPORATION

ONO LLC A DELAWARELIMITED LIABILITY COMPAN

SOUTHHAMPTON INC AWYOMING CORPORATION

L SCOTT MCCLANAHANA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPO

P.O. Box 3570

Palm Desert, CA 92261

LEROY SCOTT MCCLANAHAN

Palm Desert, CA 92261

JEFF COOMBS

Guadalajara, MX 44620

AVAF HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDERHOLT WHITTAKER LLP

73525 El Paseo Ste E-2516

Palm Desert, CA 92260

MCDERMOTT, THOMAS J.

77-530 Enfield Lane Suite H-1

Palm Desert, CA 92211

Defendant Attorneys

MCCLANAHAN, L. SCOTT

P.O. Box 3570

Palm Desert, CA 92261

MC CLANAHAN, L. SCOTT

74-075 El Paseo Suite A-14

Palm Desert, CA 92260

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/22/2011 OF 901275 ALBERTA LTD SERVED ON ONO LLC A DELAWARELIMITED LIABILITY COMPAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/22/2011 OF 901275 ALBERTA LTD SERVED ON SOUTHHAMPTON INC AWYOMING CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/02/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

170.6 FILED BY SOUTHHAMPTON IN

170.6 FILED BY SOUTHHAMPTON INC AWYOMING CORPORATION AGAINST JUDGE RANDALL D WHITE GRANTED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/22/2011 OF 901275 ALBERTA LTD BY ONO LLC A DELAWARELIMITED LIABILITY COMPAN REPRESENTED BY L. SCOTT MCCLANAHAN FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/22/2011 OF 901275 ALBERTA LTD BY LEROY SCOTT MCCLANAHAN REPRESENTED BY L. SCOTT MCCLANAHAN FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP.

DECLARATION OF JEFF COOMBS RE

DECLARATION OF JEFF COOMBS RE MOTION TO COMPEL FILED

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/22/2011 OF 901275 ALBERTA LTD SERVED ON LLO HOLDINGS INC APANAMA CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/20/12 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE L. WE

DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE L. WEISMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLTFFS OPPOSITION TO MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CE

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING MINUTE ORDER DATED 2/27/14.

NOTICE OF TRIAL BY 901275 ALBE

NOTICE OF TRIAL BY 901275 ALBERTA LTD FILED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTO

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL FOR 901275 ALBERTA LTD BY ANDERHOLT WHITTAKERLLP FILED

NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL-L.SC

NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL-L.SCOTT MCCLANAHAN A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION BY 901275 ALBERTA LTD FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

FILED: PLAINTIFFS TRIAL BRIEF

FILED: PLAINTIFFS TRIAL BRIEF RE: BINDING EFFECT OF DEFA ULT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFT L. SCOTT MCCLANAHAN

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE RE

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE RE CA. CODE SEC 17153 & 16404 BY PLAINTIFF FILED.

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2017
  • CLERK'S CALENDAR - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • 901275 ALBERTA LTD/THOMAS J. MCDERMOTT IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 7/18 AND SUBMIT JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • CLERK'S CALENDER - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS SET 2/07/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. INEXH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED: COURTS LIST OF EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: JUDGMENT/DECL/DECL/MEMO SUBMITTED BY 901275 ALBERTA LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST 901275 ALBERTA LTD FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST ONO LLC A DELAWARELIMITED LIABILITY COMPAN, SOUTHHAMPTON INC AWYOMING CORPORATION, L SCOTT MCCLANAHANA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPO, JEFF COOMBS, AVAF HOLDINGS LLC PURSUANT TO CRC 3.110(G).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • HOFRD HEARING SET FOR 06/29/16 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
219 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/22/2011 OF 901275 ALBERTA LTD SERVED ON SOUTHHAMPTON INC AWYOMING CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/02/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/22/2011 OF 901275 ALBERTA LTD SERVED ON AVAF HOLDINGS LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/22/2011 OF 901275 ALBERTA LTD SERVED ON LEROY SCOTT MCCLANAHAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/22/2011 OF 901275 ALBERTA LTD SERVED ON L SCOTT MCCLANAHANA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/22/2011 OF 901275 ALBERTA LTD SERVED ON LLO HOLDINGS INC APANAMA CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/22/2011 OF 901275 ALBERTA LTD SERVED ON ONO LLC A DELAWARELIMITED LIABILITY COMPAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/22/2011 OF 901275 ALBERTA LTD AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less