This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/03/2017 at 05:19:53 (UTC).

3RD AND VINE LLC VS NIMER

Case Summary

On 10/06/2016 3RD AND VINE LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against NIMER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3648

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

3RD AND VINE, LLC

Defendant

DIAA NIMER

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN E BOUZANE

474 Orange Show Road

San Bernanrdino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2016 OF 3RD AND VINE, LLC AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92507.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2016 OF 3RD AND VINE, LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO DIAA NIMER; AND MAILED ON 10/06/16 FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2016 OF 3RD AND VINE, LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO DIAA NIMER; AND MAILED ON 10/06/16 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2016 OF 3RD AND VINE, LLC AS TO DIAA NIMER, DIAA NIMER, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2016 OF 3RD AND VINE, LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 10/06/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 10/27/16

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY 3RD AND VINE, LLC.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEF

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2016 OF 3RD AND VINE, LLC REMOVE ATTORNEY H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES FOR PARTY(S) 3RD AND VINE, LLC AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF JOHNE BOUZANE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2016 OF 3RD AND VINE, LLC - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGME

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2017
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY 3RD AND VINE, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT - DEPARTMENT MV1UD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW IS SET ON 1/24/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. DJUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2016 OF 3RD AND VINE, LLC - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2016 OF 3RD AND VINE, LLC REMOVE ATTORNEY H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES FOR PARTY(S) 3RD AND VINE, LLC AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF JOHNE BOUZANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2016 OF 3RD AND VINE, LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO DIAA NIMER; AND MAILED ON 10/06/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2016 OF 3RD AND VINE, LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO DIAA NIMER; AND MAILED ON 10/06/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92507.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 12/05/16 AT 8:00 IN FWMV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2016 OF 3RD AND VINE, LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT MV1UD - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less