This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 11:26:02 (UTC).

1097 N STATE LLC VS ANDERSON/MINER

Case Summary

On 03/08/2017 1097 N STATE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANDERSON/MINER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0428

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hemet Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1097 N STATE LLC

Defendants

FANNIE ANDERSON

Pittsburg, CA 94565

MOALEA MINER

Hemet, CA 92543

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL LIBRATY

520 W. Willow Street

Long Beach, CA 90806

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/08/2017 OF 1097 N STATE LLC AS TO MOALEA MINER, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY 1097 N STATE LLC - HEMET (FORM UD-150).

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 06/07/17 H1 COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS)

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE JAMES T WARREN.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY 1097 N STATE LLC.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92543.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/08/2017 OF 1097 N STATE LLC AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/08/2017 OF 1097 N STATE LLC BY FANNIE ANDERSON REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER ON ATTY MICHEAL LIBRATY WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/20/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY FANNIE ANDERSON IS GRANTED; CLERK D.JAGTIANI (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/08/2017 OF 1097 N STATE LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO MOALEA MINER; AND MAILED ON 03/20/17 FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/08/2017 OF 1097 N STATE LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO FANNIE ANDERSON; AND MAILED ON 03/20/17 FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/08/2017 OF 1097 N STATE LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 03/20/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: FA

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY 1097 N STATE LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE JAMES T WARREN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE - HEMET; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 06/07/17 H1 COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (HEMET) SET; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER - HEMET SET FOR 6/07/17, AT 10:00 IN H1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY 1097 N STATE LLC - HEMET (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/08/2017 OF 1097 N STATE LLC AS TO MOALEA MINER, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/08/2017 OF 1097 N STATE LLC BY FANNIE ANDERSON REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 5/08/17 AT 8:00 IN CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/08/2017 OF 1097 N STATE LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92543.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT H1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less