This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 16:03:12 (UTC).

Vuong, Phuong Ngoc

Case Summary

On 10/15/2022 Vuong, Phuong Ngoc was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2975

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

Vuong, Phuong Ngoc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Kazarian, Bryan Ray

Trunk, Adrienne Ly

Harrington, James P

Hua, An

Molchan, Kyle R.

Le, Trang Thanh (John)

Kazarian, Alexandra

Gonzalez, Celeste

Albright, Neal S

Avola, Melyssa

Duffy, William Joseph

Ho, Tram

Walker, Bradley R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Bail Review; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Motion -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Bail Review; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Motion -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Bail Review; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Bail Review; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Bail Review; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Chambers Work -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2022
  • DocketSeq: 4; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 10/15/2022; Section Statute: 422(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: Criminal threats; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 11/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2022
  • DocketSeq: 3; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 10/15/2022; Section Statute: 368(b)(1) PC; OL: F; Violation: Inflicting injury on elder adult; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 11/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2022
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 10/15/2022; Section Statute: 245(a)(1) PC; OL: F; Violation: Assault with deadly weapon other than firearm; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 11/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 10/15/2022; Section Statute: 664(a)-PC187(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: Attempted murder; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 11/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less