This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 18:25:33 (UTC).

Turner Gordon, Kyle Asa, Turnergordon, Kyle Ace Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Turner Gordon, Kyle Asa, Turnergordon, Kyle Ace was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3380

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Turnergordon, Kyle Ace

Turner Gordon, Kyle Asa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Hernandez, Mike

Deputy Public Defender,

Kelly, Stacy

Sung, Eugene

Albright, Neal S

Campbell, Andrea

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2023
  • SentenceSent Seq #: 1; Type: INFORMAL; Term: 1 years; Status; History; Status: Active; Status Date: 12/19/2022; End Date: 12/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Firearms Relinquishment; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • SentenceCount: 2; Sentence: Mental Health Program

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • SentenceCount: 2; Sentence: 36 days Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • SentenceCount: 2; Sentence: 1 years Probation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/02/2022; Section Statute: 417(a)(1) PC; OL: M; Violation: Brandishing a weapon; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/19/2022; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/02/2022; Section Statute: 245(a)(1) PC; OL: F; Violation: Assault with deadly weapon other than firearm; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/06/2022; Disposition: Dismissed; Dispo Date: 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less