This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/09/2023 at 16:12:00 (UTC).

Timmons, Jimmy, Timmons, Jimmy Earl Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2023 Timmons, Jimmy, Timmons, Jimmy Earl was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0213

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Timmons, Jimmy Earl

Timmons, Jimmy

Timmons, Jimmy Earl JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Hernandez, Mike

Deputy Public Defender,

Dinsmoor, Larisa

Gonzalez, Celeste

Jordi, Jilana

Walker, Bradley R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • BondDetails; Detail; Action: Active; Action Date: 02/14/2023; Amount: $10,000.00; Bail Date: 02/14/2023; Post Amount: 02/14/2023; Bondsman: $10,000.00; Surety: The Bail Boys

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/16/2023; Section Statute: 487(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: Grand theft; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less