This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 22:47:22 (UTC).

Terry, Ben Jedidiah

Case Summary

On 08/06/2022 Terry, Ben Jedidiah was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8655

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

Terry, Ben Jedidiah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Meyer, Paul S.

Rice, Dustin

Dosky-McQuade, Emma Nadia

Karcher, Leandra

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: H8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: H8; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: H8; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: H8; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2022
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 08/06/2022; Section Statute: 23152(b) VC; OL: M; Violation: Driving With A Blood Alcohol Content of .08% or More

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 08/06/2022; Section Statute: 23152(a) VC; OL: M; Violation: Driving under the influence of alcohol

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less