This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/25/2023 at 16:10:39 (UTC).

Star, Kevin Robert, Starr, Kevin Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Star, Kevin Robert, Starr, Kevin was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0199

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Starr, Kevin Robert

Starr, Kevin

Star, Kevin Robert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Hernandez, Mike

Deputy Public Defender,

Soares, Jennifer

Stokke, Karyn

Patridge, Bryan Paul

Gonzalez, Celeste

Stone, Clarissa

Walker, Bradley R

Cavendish, Paige

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Failure to Appear; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • BondDetails; Detail; Action: Active; Action Date: 02/06/2023; Amount: $20,000.00; Detail; Action: FORFEITED; Action Date: 03/09/2023; Amount: $20,000.00; Detail; Action: Reopened; Action Date: 03/10/2023; Amount: $20,000.00; Bail Date: 02/06/2023; Post Amount: 02/06/2023; Bondsman: $20,000.00; Surety: Savage Bail Bonds

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Bail Review; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSeq: 5; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/13/2023; Section Statute: 11364(a) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of controlled substance paraphernalia; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSeq: 4; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/13/2023; Section Statute: 148.9(a) PC; OL: M; Violation: Falsely representing self to officer; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSeq: 3; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/13/2023; Section Statute: 22810(a) PC; OL: M; Violation: Possession of tear gas and tear gas weapon; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/13/2023; Section Statute: 11378 HS; OL: F; Violation: Possession of controlled substance with intent to sell; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/13/2023; Section Statute: 11351 HS; OL: F; Violation: Possession of controlled substance with intent to sell; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less