This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 00:42:14 (UTC).

Rodriguez, Ace, Rodriguez, Jose Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2022 Rodriguez, Ace, Rodriguez, Jose was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3005

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Rodriguez, Steven

Rodriguez, Steven Jose

Rodriguez, Ace

Rodriguez, Jose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Hernandez, Mike

Deputy Public Defender,

Caress, Marc

Kingsley, Patrick

Ordonez, Jose Don

Avola, Melyssa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • SentenceCount: 1,2; Sentence: Restitution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • SentenceCount: 1,2; Sentence: 10 days Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 10/20/2022; Section Statute: 594(a)/(b)(1) PC; OL: M; Violation: Vandalism - damage $400.00 or more; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 11/04/2022; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 11/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 10/20/2022; Section Statute: 21310 PC; OL: M; Violation: Carrying Dirk or Dagger; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 11/04/2022; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 11/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less