This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 19:17:57 (UTC).

Rivas Lopez, Cristian Alexander, Rivas, Christian Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 Rivas Lopez, Cristian Alexander, Rivas, Christian was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3400

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Rivas, Cristian Alexander

Rivas Lopez, Cristian Alexander

Rivas, Cristian

Rivas, Christian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Deputy Public Defender,

Volk, Lawrence

Cotton, Lance

Patridge, Bryan Paul

Campbell, Andrea

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2024
  • SentenceSent Seq #: 1; Type: INFORMAL; Term: 1 years; Status; History; Status: Active; Status Date: 01/03/2023; End Date: 01/02/2024

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Sentencing -; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • SentenceCount: 1,2,3; Sentence: Statement of Assets

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • SentenceCount: 3; Sentence: Restitution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • SentenceCount: 3; Sentence: 52 days Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • SentenceCount: 3; Sentence: 1 years Probation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • BailDetails; Detail; Action: Active; Action Date: 12/30/2022; Amount: $500.00; Detail; Action: Exonerated; Action Date: 01/03/2023; Amount: $0.00; Bail Date: 12/30/2022; Post Amount: 12/30/2022; Avail Amount: $500.00; Depositor: $500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSeq: 3; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/05/2022; Section Statute: 10851(a) VC; OL: M; Violation: Unlawful taking of vehicle; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/16/2022; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/05/2022; Section Statute: 487(d)(1) PC; OL: F; Violation: Grand theft, auto; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/07/2022; Disposition: Dismissed; Dispo Date: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/05/2022; Section Statute: 496d(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: Buying or receiving stolen vehicle or equipment; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/07/2022; Disposition: Dismissed; Dispo Date: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less