This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/19/2023 at 02:23:37 (UTC).

Price, Janathan H, Price, Jonathan Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2023 Price, Janathan H, Price, Jonathan was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0201

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Price, Jonathan H

Price, Jonathan Henry

Price, Jonathon Henry

Price, Jonathan

Price, Jonathon H

Price, Janathan H

Price, Jonathan M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Tavoularis, Sperry

Deputy Alternate Defender,

Deputy Public Defender,

Gomez, Steven

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Bail Review; Courtroom: W11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • DocketSeq: 3; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/14/2023; Section Statute: 11364(a) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of controlled substance paraphernalia; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/14/2023; Section Statute: 11350(a) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of a controlled substance; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/14/2023; Section Statute: 11378 HS; OL: F; Violation: Possession of controlled substance with intent to sell; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less