This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 15:21:05 (UTC).

Nissan, Shahar

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Nissan, Shahar was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5744

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

Nissan, Shahar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Goldman, Jeremy

Targoff, Allison Taylor

Batth, Gagan

Harrington, Caitlin

Stein, David A.

Karcher, Leandra

Burwick, Kathreine Emily

Walker, Coral

Burwick, Katherine Emily

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H5; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H5; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H5; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H5; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H7; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Chambers Work -; Courtroom: H7; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H7; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Chambers Work -; Courtroom: H7; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H7; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Chambers Work -; Courtroom: H7; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H7; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Jury Trial -; Courtroom: H7; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Chambers Work -; Courtroom: H7; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H7; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Chambers Work -; Courtroom: H8; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: H8; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Chambers Work -; Courtroom: H8; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 05/26/2020; Section Statute: 23152(b) VC; OL: M; Violation: Driving With A Blood Alcohol Content of .08% or More; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 11/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 05/26/2020; Section Statute: 23152(a) VC; OL: M; Violation: Driving under the influence of alcohol; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 11/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Burwick, Kathreine Emily

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEIN, DAVID A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karcher, Leandra

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Targoff, Allison Taylor