This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/29/2022 at 15:17:30 (UTC).

Morales, Ona, Morales, Onamarie Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2022 Morales, Ona, Morales, Onamarie was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1567

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Morales, Onamarie Jazarrah

Morales, Onamarie

Morales, Ona

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Deputy Public Defender,

Morrison, Michael

Dosky-McQuade, Emma Nadia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Jury Trial -; Courtroom: W18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 11/24/2022; Section Statute: 243(e)(1) PC; OL: M; Violation: Battery; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 11/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dosky-McQuade, Emma Nadia

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morrison, Michael