This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/01/2023 at 15:36:37 (UTC).

Martinez, Carloina, Martinez, Carolina Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2023 Martinez, Carloina, Martinez, Carolina was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0218

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Rodriguez, Carolina Martinez

Rodriguez, Carloina Martinez

Martinez, Carloina

Martinez, Carolina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Tavoularis, Sperry

Deputy Alternate Defender,

Henderson, Stephanie

Johnson, Stephanie D

Magtoto, Clarisse

Zarrabi, Rachel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Warrant Hold; Courtroom: H1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • BondDetails; Detail; Action: Active; Action Date: 04/18/2023; Amount: $25,000.00; Bail Date: 04/18/2023; Post Amount: 04/18/2023; Bondsman: $25,000.00; Surety: Aladdin Bail Bonds

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: C57; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2023
  • DocketSeq: 4; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/21/2023; Section Statute: 459.5(a) PC; OL: M; Violation: Shoplifting-value less than $950; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2023
  • DocketSeq: 3; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/21/2023; Section Statute: 148.9(a) PC; OL: M; Violation: Falsely representing self to officer; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2023
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/21/2023; Section Statute: 476 PC; OL: F; Violation: Make/possess fictitious instruments; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2023
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/21/2023; Section Statute: 530.5(c)(2) PC; OL: F; Violation: Fraudulently acquires, or retains personal identifying information w/prior conviction; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less