This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/22/2021 at 23:16:57 (UTC).

Martin, Kimberly Renee

Case Summary

On 05/01/2018 Martin, Kimberly Renee was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0733

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

Martin, Kimberly Renee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Alvarez, Claudia C.

Alex, Christopher

Feldman, Daniel

Cerrillo, Justin

Deputy Public Defender,

Sweeny, Jessica Ann

Bethune, Randall

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/21/2022

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Trial Setting Conference; Courtroom: C35

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2021

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2021

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W9; Hearing Status: Cancel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2021

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Cancel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2021

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W9; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2021

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Cancel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2020

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2020

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W1; Hearing Status: Cancel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2020

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W1; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2020

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Chambers Work -; Courtroom: H1; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
02/20/2020

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W1; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2020

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W1; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2019

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W1; Hearing Status: Cancel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2019

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W1; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2019

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Chambers Work -; Courtroom: C5; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2019

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W1; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2019

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Bail Review; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2019

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2019

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2018

DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 05/01/2018; Section Statute: 187(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: Murder; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 04/08/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less