This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/16/2022 at 16:28:13 (UTC).

Luu, Sam, Luu, Sam Nmn Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2021 Luu, Sam, Luu, Sam Nmn was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1875

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Luu, Sam Sap

Luu, Sam

Luu, Sam Nmn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Shkolnikov, Edward

Vicino, Danielle

Devereux, Michael Sean

Lin, Esther

Thompson, Amy L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W10; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W10; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W10; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W10; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: W3; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 09/19/2021; Section Statute: 23152(b) VC; OL: M; Violation: Driving With A Blood Alcohol Content of .08% or More; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 04/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 09/19/2021; Section Statute: 23152(a) VC; OL: M; Violation: Driving under the influence of alcohol; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 04/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less