This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/09/2022 at 15:22:51 (UTC).

Laradiaz, Jonathan

Case Summary

On 12/19/2021 Laradiaz, Jonathan was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0028

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

Laradiaz, Jonathan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Deputy Public Defender,

Fernandez, Brenda

Rice, Dustin

Gardner, Catherine

Kim, Jenny

Angel, Richard

Santos, Pamela Y.

Walker, Coral

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2025
  • SentenceSent Seq #: 1; Type: INFORMAL; Term: 3 years; Status; History; Status: Active; Status Date: 01/19/2022; End Date: 01/18/2025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Proof of enrollment; Courtroom: H10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Jury Trial -; Courtroom: H6; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Jury Trial -; Courtroom: H6; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • SentenceCount: 1,2,3,4; Sentence: Statement of Assets

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: Restitution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: Batterers' Treatment Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: 8 hours Community Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: 64 days Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: 3 years Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H6; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H6; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H6; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: H8; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: H8; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: H8; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • DocketSeq: 4; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/19/2021; Section Statute: 21310 PC; OL: M; Violation: Carrying Dirk or Dagger; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/21/2021; Disposition: Dismissed; Dispo Date: 01/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • DocketSeq: 3; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/19/2021; Section Statute: 11364(a) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of controlled substance paraphernalia; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/21/2021; Disposition: Dismissed; Dispo Date: 01/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/19/2021; Section Statute: 11377(a) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of a controlled substance; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/21/2021; Disposition: Dismissed; Dispo Date: 01/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/19/2021; Section Statute: 273.5(a) PC; OL: M; Violation: Corporal injury - on spouse/cohabitant; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/19/2022; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 01/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angel, Richard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gardner, Catherine

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Santos, Pamela Y.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Walker, Coral