This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 19:02:10 (UTC).

Jackson, Stefani, Jackson, Stefani Marie Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Jackson, Stefani, Jackson, Stefani Marie was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3385

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Jackson, Stefani Marie

Jackson, Stefani

Jackson, Stefanie Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Davis, Wayne

Deputy Public Defender,

Bethune, Randall

Patridge, Bryan Paul

Cotton, Lance

Albright, Neal S

Ashworth, Amanda Ann

Choi, Jessica

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Bail Review; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Failure to Appear; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Failure to Appear; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSeq: 4; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/02/2022; Section Statute: 22610(a) PC; OL: M; Violation: Possession of stun gun with prior conviction; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSeq: 3; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/02/2022; Section Statute: 11350(a) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of a controlled substance; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/02/2022; Section Statute: 11379(a) HS; OL: F; Violation: Sale or transport of controlled substance; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/02/2022; Section Statute: 11378 HS; OL: F; Violation: Possession of controlled substance with intent to sell; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less