This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 19:03:13 (UTC).

Hildbrand, Garry, Hillbrand, Garry Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2022 Hildbrand, Garry, Hillbrand, Garry was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3386

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Layman, Garry Grover

Hillbrand, Garry

Layman, Gerry Grover

Hildbrand, Garry

Layman, Gary Grover

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Deputy Public Defender,

Bartholomew, Melani

Song, Kevin J.

Cotton, Lance

Stone, Clarissa

Patridge, Bryan Paul

Mongrut, Pedro

Albright, Neal S

Choi, Jessica

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W16; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: C5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: C5; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: C5; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: C5; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W16; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2022
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/03/2022; Section Statute: 487(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: Grand theft

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/03/2022; Section Statute: 459-460(b) PC; OL: F; Violation: Burglary second degree

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less