This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/09/2022 at 14:50:55 (UTC).

Hidalgo, Rosa Elia

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 Hidalgo, Rosa Elia was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0575

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

Hidalgo, Rosa Elia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Ernenwein, Robert Stanley

Molchan, Kyle R.

Lund, Keegan Dean

Gossett-Ornelas, Alyssa

Johnson, Emily

Mathes, Michelle

Laverone, Louis

O'Sullivan, Meghan Elizabeth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Jury Trial -; Courtroom: C47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: C47; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: C46; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: C47; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: C46; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: C52; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: C46; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: C52; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: C53; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: C53; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: C50; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: C50; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: C54; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: C54; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Chambers Work -; Courtroom: C46; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • BondDetails; Detail; Action: Active; Action Date: 07/10/2020; Amount: $50,000.00; Detail; Action: Exonerated; Action Date: 09/28/2020; Amount: $50,000.00; Bail Date: 07/10/2020; Post Amount: 07/10/2020; Bondsman: $50,000.00; Surety: Brian Fuentes Bail Bonds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 07/08/2020; Section Statute: 273.5(a) PC; OL: M; Violation: Corporal injury - on spouse/cohabitant; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Molchan, Kyle R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laverone, Louis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lund, Keegan Dean

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'Sullivan, Meghan Elizabeth