Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/04/2021 at 16:18:27 (UTC).

Galvez, David

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 Galvez, David was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0389

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

Galvez, David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Rim, David H

Deputy Public Defender,

Flory, Mike

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: C55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Mandatory Settlement Conference; Courtroom: C57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSeq: 4; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/02/2021; Section Statute: 594(a)/(b)(2)(A) PC; OL: M; Violation: Vandalism-less than $400 in damages; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 02/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSeq: 3; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/02/2021; Section Statute: 236/237(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: False imprisonment effected by violence, menace, fraud, or deceit; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 02/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 1; Violation Date: 02/02/2021; Section Statute: 12022.7(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: ENH-Inflict great bodily injury; Plea: DENIED; Plea Date: 02/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/02/2021; Section Statute: 245(a)(4) PC; OL: F; Violation: Assault with force likely to produce GBI; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 02/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 1; Violation Date: 02/02/2021; Section Statute: 12022.7(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: ENH-Inflict great bodily injury; Plea: DENIED; Plea Date: 02/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/02/2021; Section Statute: 273.5(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: Corporal injury - on spouse/cohabitant; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 02/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less