This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/06/2023 at 15:23:30 (UTC).

Ewald, Douglass A, Ewald, Douglass Alexander Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 Ewald, Douglass A, Ewald, Douglass Alexander was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2458

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Ewald, Douglass Alexander

Ewald, Douglass A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Deputy Public Defender,

Kirkwood, Marji

Dosky-McQuade, Emma Nadia

Cota, Danielle

Boyd, Lauren

Soliman, Nadine

Magtoto, Clarisse

Vu, Dang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: H1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: H1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: H1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: H1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Bail Review; Courtroom: H1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 11/30/2022; Section Statute: 2800.1(a) VC; OL: M; Violation: Evading Peace Officer; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 11/30/2022; Section Statute: 245(a)(1) PC; OL: F; Violation: Assault with deadly weapon other than firearm; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vu, Dang

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kirkwood, Marji

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Boyd, Lauren

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dosky-McQuade, Emma Nadia