Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/17/2020 at 17:42:21 (UTC).

Error,, Valasquez, Miguel Angel Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2020 Error,, Valasquez, Miguel Angel was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7715

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Velasquez, Miguel Angel

Error,

Valasquez, Miguel Angel

Vino,

Velaquez, Miguel Angel

Velazquez, Miguel Angel

Velazquez, Miguel

Velasquez, Miguel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Brown, Alexander J.

Nichols, Cynthia

Smith, George

Rim, David H

To, Van-Anh

Deputy Public Defender,

Alvarez, Claudia C.

Fletcher, Kimberly

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Mandatory Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Mandatory Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Mandatory Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W2; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: W1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2020
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 05/24/2020; Section Statute: 11364(a) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of controlled substance paraphernalia; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 10/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ERROR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer To, Van-Anh

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fletcher, Kimberly

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brown, Alexander J.