This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 19:11:33 (UTC).

Elizalde, Zechariah Christian, Elizalde, Zechariah Christian Field Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2022 Elizalde, Zechariah Christian, Elizalde, Zechariah Christian Field was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3393

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Elizalde, Zechariah Christianfield

Elizalde, Zechariah Christian

Fieldelizalde, Zechariah Christian

Fieldelizalde, Zechariah C

Elizalde, Zechariah Christian Field

Field, Zechariah

Elizalde, Zechariah Christianfi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Deputy Public Defender,

Bethune, Randall

Padilla, Melissa A.

Cotton, Lance

Gonzalez, Celeste

Albright, Neal S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/04/2022; Section Statute: 148(a)(1) PC; OL: M; Violation: Resisting public or peace officer; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/04/2022; Section Statute: 30305(a)(1) PC; OL: F; Violation: Prohibited person own ammunition; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less