This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/16/2022 at 14:54:08 (UTC).

Eidlhuber, James, Eidlhuber, James Louis Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2019 Eidlhuber, James, Eidlhuber, James Louis was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1347

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Eidlhuber, James Louis

Eidlhuber, James

Eldhuber, James L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Kamran, Alaleh

Braun, Marie I

Acosta, Frank

Page, James Clifford III

Abuzalaf, Shaun Ihsan

Vasquez, Evelyn

Cope-Vega, Bethel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2025
  • SentenceSent Seq #: 1; Type: FORMAL; Term: 3 years; Status; History; Status: Active; Status Date: 02/02/2022; End Date: 02/01/2025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Further Proceedings -; Courtroom: C55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Firearms Relinquishment; Courtroom: C55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • SentenceCount: 5,8,3; Sentence: 29 days Cal Trans/Physical Labor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • SentenceCount: 5,3,8; Sentence: Batterers' Treatment Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • SentenceCount: 3,5,8; Sentence: Restitution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • SentenceCount: 5,3,8; Sentence: 3 years Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: C55; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: VC7; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: C7; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2019
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: C57; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • BondDetails; Detail; Action: Active; Action Date: 06/04/2019; Amount: $100,000.00; Detail; Action: Exonerated; Action Date: 02/02/2022; Amount: $100,000.00; Bail Date: 06/04/2019; Post Amount: 06/04/2019; Bondsman: $100,000.00; Surety: 1st Priority Bail Bonds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketSeq: 8; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/11/2019; Section Statute: 136.1(b)(1) PC; OL: M; Violation: Dissuading witness from reporting crime; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 02/02/2022; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 02/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2019
  • DocketSeq: 7; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/10/2019; Section Statute: 136.1(c)(1) PC; OL: F; Violation: Dissuade witness by force; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 06/21/2019; Disposition: Dismissed; Dispo Date: 02/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2019
  • DocketSeq: 6; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/10/2019; Section Statute: 236/237(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: False imprisonment effected by violence, menace, fraud, or deceit; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 06/21/2019; Disposition: Dismissed; Dispo Date: 02/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2019
  • DocketSeq: 5; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/10/2019; Section Statute: 422(a) PC; OL: M; Violation: Criminal threats; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 02/02/2022; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 02/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2019
  • DocketSeq: 4; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/10/2019; Section Statute: 245(a)(4) PC; OL: F; Violation: Assault with force likely to produce GBI; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 06/21/2019; Disposition: Dismissed; Dispo Date: 02/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2019
  • DocketSeq: 3; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/10/2019; Section Statute: 273.5(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: Corporal injury - on spouse/cohabitant; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 02/02/2022; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 02/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2019
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/10/2019; Section Statute: 220(a)(1) PC; OL: F; Violation: Assault with intent to commit sexual offense; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 06/21/2019; Disposition: Dismissed; Dispo Date: 02/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2019
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/10/2019; Section Statute: 289(a)(1) PC; OL: F; Violation: Sexual penetration by foreign object; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 06/21/2019; Disposition: Dismissed; Dispo Date: 02/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Acosta, Frank

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Page, James Clifford III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abuzalaf, Shaun Ihsan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAUN MARIE I