This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/23/2023 at 16:07:54 (UTC).

Dunn, Joseph, Dunn, Kenneth Jay Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 Dunn, Joseph, Dunn, Kenneth Jay was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3394

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Dunn, Kenneth Joseph

Fournier, Kenneth Joseph

Fourner, Kenneth

Fournier, Ken Joseph

Dunn, Kenneth Jay

Dunn, Joseph

Fournier, Dustin Desmond

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Deputy Public Defender,

Patridge, Bryan Paul

Andrews, Marty Ann

Walker, Bradley R

Cotton, Lance

Campbell, Andrea

Hernandez, Mike

Dinsmoor, Larisa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Failure to Appear; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Failure to Appear; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/05/2022; Section Statute: 666.5(a)/10851(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: Theft with prior felony conviction of driving or taking of vehicle; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less