This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/21/2022 at 16:31:15 (UTC).

Domingo, Daniel, Domingo, Daniel Godo Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 Domingo, Daniel, Domingo, Daniel Godo was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1596

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Domingo, Daniel Godo

Domingo, Daniel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Hernandez, Mike

Deputy Public Defender,

Macias, Melissa

Molchan, Kyle R.

Ordonez, Jose Don

Lindquist, Larry Joe

Gonzalez, Celeste

Albright, Neal S

Avola, Melyssa

Caress, Marc

Campbell, Andrea

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2024
  • SentenceSent Seq #: 1; Type: FORMAL; Term: 2 years; Status; History; Status: Active; Status Date: 12/06/2022; End Date: 12/05/2024

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Firearms Relinquishment; Courtroom: W16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • SentenceCount: 4,7; Sentence: 270 days Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • SentenceCount: 4,7; Sentence: 2 years Probation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • BondDetails; Detail; Action: Active; Action Date: 08/08/2022; Amount: $25,000.00; Detail; Action: Exonerated; Action Date: 12/06/2022; Amount: $25,000.00; Bail Date: 08/08/2022; Post Amount: 08/08/2022; Bondsman: $25,000.00; Surety: Bail Hotline Bail Bonds

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSeq: 7; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 06/10/2022; Section Statute: 487(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: Grand theft; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/06/2022; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSeq: 6; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 06/10/2022; Section Statute: 11364(a) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of controlled substance paraphernalia; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 06/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSeq: 5; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 06/10/2022; Section Statute: 11377(a) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of a controlled substance; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 06/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSeq: 4; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 06/10/2022; Section Statute: 11350(a) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of a controlled substance; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/06/2022; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSeq: 3; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 06/10/2022; Section Statute: 242 PC; OL: M; Violation: Battery; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 06/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 06/10/2022; Section Statute: 240 PC; OL: M; Violation: Assault; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 06/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 06/10/2022; Section Statute: 211/212.5(c) PC; OL: F; Violation: Robbery; second degree; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 06/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Avola, Melyssa

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Campbell, Andrea

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc Hollis Caress

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Albright, Neal S