This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 19:08:28 (UTC).

Doe, Jane, Kierstead, Jennifer Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Doe, Jane, Kierstead, Jennifer was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3390

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Kierstead, Jennifer Renee

Kierstead, Jennifer

Doe, Jane

Kierstead, Jennifer R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Deputy Public Defender,

Andrews, Marty Ann

Ordonez, Jose Don

Cotton, Lance

Albright, Neal S

Campbell, Andrea

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Failure to Appear; Courtroom: CJ1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2022
  • DocketSeq: 5; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/03/2022; Section Statute: 25620(a) BP; OL: I; Violation: Public possession of open container; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2022
  • DocketSeq: 3; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/03/2022; Section Statute: 602(o) PC; OL: M; Violation: Refuse or fail to leave land ordered by a peace officer upon owner's request; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2022
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/03/2022; Section Statute: 647(f) PC; OL: M; Violation: Public intoxication; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSeq: 4; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/02/2022; Section Statute: 459.5(a) PC; OL: M; Violation: Shoplifting-value less than $950; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/02/2022; Section Statute: 211/212.5(c) PC; OL: F; Violation: Robbery; second degree; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less