This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/25/2023 at 16:03:34 (UTC).

Diaz, Alejandro, Diaz, Alejandro Villa Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 Diaz, Alejandro, Diaz, Alejandro Villa was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0554

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Villa, Alejandro Diaz

Diaz, Alejandro Villa

Diaz, Alejandro

Villa, Alejandro Villa

Diaz, Alex

Villa, Alex Diaz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Hernandez, Mike

Deputy Public Defender,

Horan, Julian Jaffrey

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: C57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: C57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/23/2023; Section Statute: 459-460(b) PC; OL: F; Violation: Burglary second degree; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 02/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less