This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/08/2022 at 15:44:11 (UTC).

Cuenca, Eric, Cuenca, Erik Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 Cuenca, Eric, Cuenca, Erik was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2843

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Cuenca, Erik

Taz,

Quenca, Eric

Slacker,

Cuenca, Eric

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Singh, Sonya

Cope-Vega, Bethel

Flory, Mike

Stephenson, Jared

Sinclair, John M

Dinh, Andrew

Valle, Fernando

Deputy Alternate Defender,

Miller, Mallory

Bradwell, Patricia

Schoenleben, Bradley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • SentenceSent Seq #: 1; Type: FORMAL; Term: 3 years; Status; History; Status: Active; Status Date: 03/10/2020; End Date: 03/09/2023; History; Status: Revoked; Status Date: 05/18/2020; End Date: 03/09/2023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Probation Violation Formal Hearing; Courtroom: N3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Probation Violation Disposition and Reset; Courtroom: N12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Probation Violation Arraignment; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Chambers Work -; Courtroom: C43; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Firearms Relinquishment; Courtroom: C53; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Firearms Relinquishment; Courtroom: N3; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Disposition and Reset; Courtroom: N3; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • SentenceCount: 3; Sentence: Restitution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: 282 days Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2019
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: N3; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: N3; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: N3; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: N3; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketSeq: 4; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 10/22/2019; Section Statute: 21201(d)(1) VC; OL: I; Violation: Bicycle operated during darkness shall be equipped with a white lamp visible 300 feet; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 10/24/2019; Disposition: Dismissed; Dispo Date: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketSeq: 3; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 10/22/2019; Section Statute: 485 PC; OL: M; Violation: Petty theft of lost property; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 03/10/2020; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 10/22/2019; Section Statute: 21310 PC; OL: F; Violation: Carrying a Dirk or Dagger; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 03/10/2020; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 10/22/2019; Section Statute: 11379(a) HS; OL: F; Violation: Sale or transport of controlled substance; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 03/10/2020; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Slacker, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephenson, Jared

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miller, Mallory

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dinh, Andrew