This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/14/2022 at 15:55:07 (UTC).

Cuenca, Eric, Cuenca, Erik Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 Cuenca, Eric, Cuenca, Erik was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1639

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Cuenca, Erik

Taz,

Quenca, Eric

Slacker,

Cuenca, Eric

Tovar, Sonny Benjamin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Dinh, Andrew

Deputy Public Defender,

Deputy Alternate Defender,

Flory, Mike

Bradwell, Patricia

Schoenleben, Bradley

Miller, Mallory

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: N12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Bail Review; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Bail Review; Courtroom: N3; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: N3; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Disposition and Reset; Courtroom: W3; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Disposition and Reset; Courtroom: W3; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Disposition and Reset; Courtroom: W3; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Disposition and Reset; Courtroom: N3; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Mandatory Settlement Conference; Courtroom: N3; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Mandatory Settlement Conference; Courtroom: N3; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Mandatory Settlement Conference; Courtroom: N3; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSeq: 3; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 06/11/2020; Section Statute: 186.22(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: Participate in criminal street gang activity; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 1; Violation Date: 06/11/2020; Section Statute: 186.22(b)(1) PC; OL: F; Violation: ENH: Criminal street gang activity; Plea: DENIED; Plea Date: 01/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 06/11/2020; Section Statute: 29800(a)(1) PC; OL: F; Violation: Possession of firearm by a felon; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 2; Violation Date: 06/11/2020; Section Statute: 186.22(b)(1) PC; OL: F; Violation: ENH: Criminal street gang activity; Plea: DENIED; Plea Date: 01/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 1; Violation Date: 06/11/2020; Section Statute: 12022.53(b) PC; OL: F; Violation: ENH-Personal use of firearm; Plea: DENIED; Plea Date: 01/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 06/11/2020; Section Statute: 664(a)-PC211/212.5(c) PC; OL: F; Violation: Attempt Robbery; second degree; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Slacker, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schoenleben, Bradley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradwell, Patricia

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miller, Mallory