This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 16:07:59 (UTC).

Clifford, David Brian, David, Brian Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2023 Clifford, David Brian, David, Brian was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0292

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

David, Brian Clifford

David, Bryan Clifford

David, Brian C

David, Brian

Clifford, David Brian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Deputy Public Defender,

Dinsmoor, Larisa

Nguyen-McDonald, Daniel

Gonzalez, Celeste

Jordi, Jilana

Stokke, Karyn

Walker, Bradley R

Isied, Marlene

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • BondDetails; Detail; Action: Active; Action Date: 01/26/2023; Amount: $5,000.00; Bail Date: 01/26/2023; Post Amount: 01/26/2023; Bondsman: $5,000.00; Surety: Bail Hotline Bail Bonds

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/22/2023; Section Statute: 11359(b) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of cannabis for sale; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/22/2023; Section Statute: 11351 HS; OL: F; Violation: Possession of controlled substance with intent to sell; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less