This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/23/2023 at 18:34:36 (UTC).

Castillo, Ali, Maellaro, Daniel Paul Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 Castillo, Ali, Maellaro, Daniel Paul was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0546

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Maellaro, Michael James

Maellaro, Michael J

Maellaro, Michael

Maellaro, Daniel Paul

Ramirez, Eduardo

Castillo, Ali

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Hernandez, Mike

Deputy Public Defender,

Sargent, Kimberly

Nechaev, Andrew

Walker, Bradley R

Padilla, Melissa A.

Ferguson, Douglas

Isied, Marlene

Zhan, MingMing

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: C57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: C57; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • BondDetails; Detail; Action: Active; Action Date: 03/06/2023; Amount: $2,500.00; Bail Date: 03/06/2023; Post Amount: 03/06/2023; Bondsman: $2,500.00; Surety: Bail Hotline Bail Bonds

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/21/2023; Section Statute: 211/212.5(c) PC; OL: F; Violation: Robbery; second degree; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 02/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less