This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 00:10:08 (UTC).

Carter, Anthony, Scheckles, James Robert Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 Carter, Anthony, Scheckles, James Robert was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3590

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Tipton, Anthony Neil

Young, Mack

Tipton, Anthony Niel

Tipton, Anthony Neal

Carter, Anthony

Tipton, Anthony

Scheckles, James Robert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Tavoularis, Sperry

Hernandez, Mike

Deputy Alternate Defender,

Deputy Public Defender,

Campbell, Andrea

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketSeq: 10; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/19/2022; Section Statute: 20002(a) VC; OL: M; Violation: Hit and run with property damage; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketSeq: 9; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/19/2022; Section Statute: 148(a)(1) PC; OL: M; Violation: Resisting public or peace officer; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketSeq: 8; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/19/2022; Section Statute: 69 PC; OL: F; Violation: Resisting executive officer; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketSeq: 7; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/19/2022; Section Statute: 530.5(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: Unauthorized use of personal identifying information; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketSeq: 6; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/19/2022; Section Statute: 487(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: Grand theft; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketSeq: 5; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/19/2022; Section Statute: 459-460(b) PC; OL: F; Violation: Burglary second degree; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketSeq: 4; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/19/2022; Section Statute: 2800.2 VC; OL: F; Violation: Evading a peace officer/reckless driving; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/19/2022; Section Statute: 666.5(a)/496d(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: Buying or receiving stolen vehicle or equipment with a prior felony conviction; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less