This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/14/2022 at 02:19:38 (UTC).

Carmona, Jorge, Carmona, Jorge J Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Carmona, Jorge, Carmona, Jorge J was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0068

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Jeronimo, Jorge Carmona

Carmona, Jorge

Carmona, Jorge Jeronimo

Carmona, Jorge J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Flory, Mike

Lobato, Douglas L.

Deputy Alternate Defender,

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSeq: 5; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/12/2022; Section Statute: 21510(b) PC; OL: M; Violation: Carrying a switch blade knife on person; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSeq: 4; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/12/2022; Section Statute: 11364(a) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of controlled substance paraphernalia; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSeq: 3; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/12/2022; Section Statute: 11377(a) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of a controlled substance; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/12/2022; Section Statute: 288.4(b) PC; OL: F; Violation: Meeting a minor to commit lewd conduct; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 01/12/2022; Section Statute: 288.3(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: Contacting a Minor with intent to commit specified offense; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lobato, Douglas L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Flory, Mike