This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 18:27:31 (UTC).

Bazant, Dennis, Bazant, Dennis T Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Bazant, Dennis, Bazant, Dennis T was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3382

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Bazant, Dennis Todd

Bazant, Dennis

Bazant, Dennis T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Deputy Public Defender,

Andrews, Marty Ann

Ordonez, Jose Don

Cotton, Lance

Gonzalez, Celeste

Lin, Esther

Albright, Neal S

Campbell, Andrea

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2024
  • SentenceSent Seq #: 1; Type: INFORMAL; Term: 1 years; Status; History; Status: Active; Status Date: 01/06/2023; End Date: 01/05/2024

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: 180 days Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: 1 years Probation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Bail Review; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/02/2022; Section Statute: 2800.2 VC; OL: M; Violation: Driving in willful disregard for safety while evading Peace Officer; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 01/06/2023; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 01/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less