This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 20:18:24 (UTC).

Atlahua, Miguel Caliba, Caliba, Miguel Atlahua Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2022 Atlahua, Miguel Caliba, Caliba, Miguel Atlahua was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3452

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Garciagonzalez, Miguel

Garcia, Miguel Rosales

Rosales, Miguel Angel

Atlahua, Miguel Caliba

Caliba, Miguel Atlahua

Gonzalez, Miguel Martinez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Deputy Public Defender,

Moorhead, Jay

Caress, Marc

Stocks, Maria

Mandella, Sharlene

Walker, Maria-Elena

Ordonez, Jose Don

Lin, Esther

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2023
  • SentenceSent Seq #: 1; Type: INFORMAL; Term: 1 years; Status; History; Status: Active; Status Date: 12/27/2022; End Date: 12/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Firearms Relinquishment; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Chambers Work -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: Statement of Assets

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: Restitution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: 36 days Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: 1 years Probation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Bail Review; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/10/2022; Section Statute: 245(a)(1) PC; OL: M; Violation: Assault w/deadly weapon other than firearm; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/27/2022; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 12/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less