This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 00:30:56 (UTC).

Arriaga, Angel, Arriaga, Angel Alejandro Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 Arriaga, Angel, Arriaga, Angel Alejandro was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2993

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Arriaga-Benitez, Angel Alejandro

Arriaga, Angel Alejandro

Arriaga, Angel Alisandro

Benitel, Angel Alejandro Arriaga

Benitez, Angel Alejandro Arriaga

Benetez, Angel Arriaga

Benetiz, Angel Alejandro Arriaga

Benitel, Angel Alejandroarriaga

Arriaga, Angel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Deputy Public Defender,

Kingsley, Patrick

Willis, Megan

Caress, Marc

Saati, Sami

Ramos, Ryan

Avola, Melyssa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • SentenceCount: 1,2; Sentence: 90 days Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 10/18/2022; Section Statute: 11364(a) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of controlled substance paraphernalia; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 11/02/2022; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 11/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 10/18/2022; Section Statute: 69 PC; OL: M; Violation: Resisting executive officer; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 11/02/2022; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 11/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less