Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/05/2021 at 15:40:27 (UTC).

Aldarete, Thomas, Aldererte, Thomas Anthony Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 Aldarete, Thomas, Aldererte, Thomas Anthony was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0393

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Alderete, Thomas Anthony

Alderete, Tomas Antonio

Aldarete, Thomas

Aldererte, Thomas Anthony

Alderette, Thomas Anthony

Alderete, Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Alvarez, Claudia C.

Deputy Public Defender,

Davis, Wayne

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Mandatory Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/02/2021; Section Statute: 69 PC; OL: F; Violation: Resisting executive officer; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 02/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less